CT HB06833 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To update duties of the executive director of the Office of Military Affairs to more accurately reflect the current demands of the office.
Title
An Act Concerning The Qualifications And Duties Of The Executive Director Of The Office Of Military Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 315 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 46 (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 46 (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-10 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-10 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-02 | House | Public Act 15-65 |
2015-05-28 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Passed |
2015-05-08 | House | Senate Calendar Number 463 |
2015-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-06 | House | House Passed |
2015-03-24 | House | File Number 187 |
2015-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 131 |
2015-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |