CT HB06810 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - File Number 322
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - File Number 322
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To protect consumers from unfair trade practices.
Title
An Act Protecting Consumers From Unfair Trade Practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | File Number 322 |
2015-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 204 |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |