CT HB06805 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-06 - Senate Calendar Number 621
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit condominiums or cooperatives from restricting the installation of certain solar power generating systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Solar Installations In Condominiums And Cooperatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 306 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06SenateSenate Calendar Number 621
2023-06-06SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-06-06SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2023-06-06HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2023-06-06HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10043
2023-04-04HouseFile Number 410
2023-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 273
2023-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-22HouseJoint Favorable
2023-02-27HousePublic Hearing 03/03
2023-02-24HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06805&which_year=2023
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/H/PDF/2023HB-06805-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/H/PDF/2023HB-06805-R01-HB.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/lcoamd/pdf/2023LCO09881-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/lcoamd/pdf/2023LCO09997-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/lcoamd/pdf/2023LCO09947-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/amd/H/pdf/2023HB-06805-R00HA-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/FN/PDF/2023HB-06805-R000410-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/BA/PDF/2023HB-06805-R000410-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023HB-06805-R00LCO09881-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023HB-06805-R00LCO09947-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023HB-06805-R00LCO09997-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023HB-06805-R00LCO10043-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/FN/PDF/2023HB-06805-R01-FN.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TS/H/PDF/2023HB-06805-R00PD-CV126-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/VOTE/H/PDF/2023HV-00306-R00HB06805-HV.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback