CT HB06789 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-11 - File Number 484
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Labor Commissioner to study the Labor Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Suspension Of Certain Employees For Violations Of Workplace Conduct Rules Prohibiting Harassment Or Workplace Violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-23 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11HouseFile Number 484
2023-04-11HouseHouse Calendar Number 310
2023-04-11HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-04-11HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 12:00 PM
2023-03-24HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-23HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2023-02-24HousePublic Hearing 03/02
2023-02-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback