CT HB06779 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To phase in a fifty per cent increase to the exemption from state income tax on military retirement pay over a five-year period.
Title
An Act Increasing The Exemption From The Income Tax For Military Retirement Pay.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-19 | House | File Number 120 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 96 |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |