CT HB06754 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - File Number 313
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish: (1) A tax credit for certain employers that hire individuals with intellectual disability; (2) a state contracting price preference for certain businesses employing individuals with intellectual disability; and (3) a competitive grant program for certain nonprofit organizations employing individuals with intellectual disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Incentives To Increase Employment Of Individuals With Intellectual Disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseFile Number 313
2023-03-29HouseHouse Calendar Number 211
2023-03-29HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-03-29HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-23HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2023-02-24HousePublic Hearing 03/02
2023-02-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback