CT HB06750 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Public Hearing 03/08
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To revise the definition of "residential building" to include any condominium unit or dwelling in a planned unit development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Expanding The Definition Of "residential Building" In Statutes Providing Assistance To Certain Homeowners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HousePublic Hearing 03/08
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-02-06HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback