CT HB06741 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide assigned or appointed counsel in abuse and neglect proceedings, where a child's parent or guardian is accused of such abuse and neglect, immediate access to the child and the child's records.
Title
An Act Concerning The Right Of Counsel To Access Records In Certain Abuse And Neglect Proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 338 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 98 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 98 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-16 | House | Public Act 17-119 |
2017-06-06 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-05 | House | File Number 726 |
2017-05-05 | House | Senate Calendar Number 418 |
2017-05-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6561 |
2017-04-26 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-26 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-16 | House | File Number 70 |
2017-03-16 | House | House Calendar Number 82 |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-02 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-10 | House | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |
2017-02-07 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |