CT HB06741 | 2015 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - File Number 55
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To implement certain recommendations of the Task Force on Cadmium in Children's Jewelry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Cadmium In Children's Jewelry.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12HouseFile Number 55
2015-03-12HouseHouse Calendar Number 64
2015-03-12HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2015-03-12HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2015-03-06HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM
2015-02-27HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2015-02-26HouseJoint Favorable
2015-02-11HousePublic Hearing 02/17
2015-02-06HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback