CT HB06717 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical and clarifying changes to the statute governing the state's Aging and Disability Resource Center Program.
Title
An Act Concerning The State Aging And Disability Resource Center Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 215 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 45 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 45 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-05-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-05-26 | House | Public Act 15-19 |
2015-05-19 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-05-19 | House | Senate Passed |
2015-05-08 | House | Senate Calendar Number 460 |
2015-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-06 | House | House Passed |
2015-03-23 | House | File Number 179 |
2015-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 115 |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |