CT HB06709 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow eligible patients to try investigational drugs, biological products or devices.
Title
An Act Concerning The Right To Try Experimental Drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-21 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-23 | House | File Number 170 |
2015-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 113 |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |