CT HB06702 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-24 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-24 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require manufacturers of powered wheelchairs to provide documentation, tools, hardware and software, if necessary, to allow a consumer to repair, or hire an independent contractor to repair, a powered wheelchair.
Title
An Act Concerning A Consumer's Right To Timely Wheelchair Repairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-23 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary |
2023-02-24 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2023-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |