CT HB06687 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - File Number 164
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Department of Banking to study issues concerning financial institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Financial Institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-07 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseFile Number 164
2023-03-22HouseHouse Calendar Number 130
2023-03-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-03-22HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-16HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-07HouseJoint Favorable
2023-02-17HousePublic Hearing 02/23
2023-02-16HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Banking

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback