CT HB06687 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning Medical Assistance For Children And Adults Without Health Care Coverage.
Title
An Act Concerning Medical Assistance For Children And Adults Without Health Care Coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 424 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 351 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 51 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 352 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD C (Y: 52 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 353 AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 351 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 51 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 352 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD C (Y: 52 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 353 AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Public Act 21-176 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2021-06-08 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-08 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 10580 |
2021-06-08 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 10564 |
2021-06-08 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10542 |
2021-06-06 | House | Emergency Certification |