CT HB06685 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase home care provider rates to reflect the cost of providing services.
Title
An Act Increasing Home Care Provider Rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-19 | House | File Number 115 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 91 |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |