CT HB06685 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) establish a presumption of shared custody in any dispute involving the care and custody of minor children, and (2) provide the court with sanctions that may be imposed against a parent who knowingly makes a false statement to the court in a proceeding relating to the care and custody of minor children.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Legal Disputes Involving The Care And Custody Of Minor Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 398 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 590 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 590 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Special Act 13-24 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 710 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules |
2013-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8725 |
2013-05-06 | House | File Number 736 |
2013-05-06 | House | House Calendar Number 515 |
2013-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM |
2013-04-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-28 | House | Public Hearing 04/05 |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |