CT HB06684 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To assist urban municipalities by allowing municipalities to issue refunding and new bonds for maximum terms of thirty years.
Title
An Act Concerning The Maturity Date For Certain Municipal Bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2017-03-22 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |