CT HB06668 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To improve workplace protections for pregnant women.
Title
An Act Concerning Pregnant Women In The Workplace.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 312 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 187 (Y: 120 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 187 (Y: 120 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-16 | House | Public Act 17-118 |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Passed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 526 |
2017-05-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | House Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | File Number 222 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 186 |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-09 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2017-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-09 | House | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2017-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |