CT HB06666 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Public Health regarding various revisions to the public health statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Various Revisions To The Public Health Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 379 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 203 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 30 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 204 AS AMENDED (Y: 117 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 203 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 30 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 204 AS AMENDED (Y: 117 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-23 | House | Public Act 21-121 |
2021-06-07 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-28 | House | File Number 758 |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 521 |
2021-05-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-26 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 9331 |
2021-05-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9328 |
2021-05-11 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-11 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | House | File Number 539 |
2021-04-21 | House | House Calendar Number 396 |
2021-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/29 |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |