CT HB06666 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To exempt parties of certain commercial and state set-aside construction contracts from statutory prompt payment provisions if they explicitly agree to different payment terms in a written construction contract, and to shorten the time periods for required payment of general contractors and subcontractors on both public and private construction contracts from thirty days to twenty-five days, in certain cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring The Prompt Payment Of Contractors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 392 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 57 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-141
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 415
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-11HouseFile Number 613
2019-04-11HouseHouse Calendar Number 367
2019-04-11HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-11HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-05HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-02-20HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-06HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback