CT HB06664 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require contractors and subcontractors applying to the Department of Administrative Services for prequalification to state whether they have had any occupational safety and health act violations.
Title
An Act Concerning State Contractor Reporting Of Occupational Safety And Health Act Violation Information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |