CT HB06658 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow an employee who, as a condition of his or her employment, is required to execute a noncompete agreement or covenant a reasonable opportunity to seek legal advice prior to entering into such agreement or covenant.
Title
An Act Concerning Employer Use Of Noncompete Agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 617 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 333 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 333 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 13-309 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 696 |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules |
2013-06-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B |
2013-06-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8496 |
2013-06-01 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 7625 |
2013-05-14 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-14 | House | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-07 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2013-05-02 | House | File Number 693 |
2013-05-02 | House | House Calendar Number 476 |
2013-05-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-28 | House | Public Hearing 04/01 |
2013-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |