CT HB06647 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-04 - File Number 790
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-04 - File Number 790
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) create a Geographic Information Systems Advisory Council to consult with the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management, and (2) require the secretary to designate a Geographic Information Officer to oversee a Geographic Information System Center.
Title
An Act Concerning Geographic Information Systems.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 277 AS AMENDED (Y: 130 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | File Number 790 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 555 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2021-06-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9852 |
2021-05-11 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-11 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | House | File Number 551 |
2021-04-21 | House | House Calendar Number 395 |
2021-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-18 | House | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |