CT HB06643 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To enable more towns to regionalize their animal control facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Regional Animal Control Shelters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 234 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 45 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-04HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-04HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-01HousePublic Act 19-8
2019-05-28HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-05-28HouseSenate Passed
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 403
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-23HouseHouse Passed
2019-03-13HouseFile Number 53
2019-03-13HouseHouse Calendar Number 47
2019-03-13HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-13HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-26HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-25HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing 02/04
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback