CT HB06639 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a pilot program regarding building officials and resources related to the administration of the State Building Code.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program Regarding Building Officials And Resources Related To The Administration Of The State Building Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | House | File Number 545 |
2021-04-21 | House | House Calendar Number 389 |
2021-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-18 | House | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |