CT HB06635 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the time limit for temporary family assistance to sixty months, exempt benefits received during the COVID-19 public health emergency from the time limit, eliminate the penalties for families with children born after enrollment in the program and ensure benefits are adequate to meet the cost of living for beneficiaries.
Title
An Act Concerning Temporary Family Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-04 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-19 | House | File Number 507 |
2021-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 374 |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |