CT HB06623 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-05 - Senate Calendar Number 610
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require a memorandum of understanding between the Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection and Central Connecticut State University regarding the development of a forensic science laboratory and training programs aimed at detectives and other police officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring A Memorandum Of Understanding Between The Commissioner Of Emergency Services And Public Protection And Central Connecticut State University For Police Detective And Other Training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 278 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-05SenateSenate Calendar Number 610
2023-06-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-06-05SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2023-06-05HouseHouse Passed
2023-03-28HouseFile Number 273
2023-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 182
2023-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-16HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-16HouseJoint Favorable
2023-02-17HousePublic Hearing 02/23
2023-02-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback