CT HB06620 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To exclude the following in contracts between health carriers and health care providers: (1) All-or-nothing clauses; (2) anti-steering clauses; (3) anti-tiering clauses; (4) gag clauses; and (5) most-favored health carrier or health plan administrator clauses.
Title
An Act Promoting Competition In Contracts Between Health Carriers And Health Care Providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-20 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-30 | House | File Number 326 |
2023-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 225 |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |