CT HB06620 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - File Number 650
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - File Number 650
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To improve student literacy and address issues relating to equity and opportunity gaps that exist in public education in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Right To Read And Addressing Opportunity Gaps And Equity In Public Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | File Number 650 |
2021-05-10 | House | House Calendar Number 469 |
2021-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2021-03-12 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |