CT HB06619 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - File Number 325
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - File Number 325
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To preserve consumer access to affordable generic drugs.
Title
An Act Concerning Prohibiting Pay For Delay.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | File Number 325 |
2023-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 224 |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-09 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |