CT HB06619 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To develop a model curriculum for grades kindergarten to grade eight, inclusive, for use by local and regional boards of education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Development Of A Kindergarten To Eight Grade Model Curriculum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM
2021-04-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-21HouseJoint Favorable
2021-04-05HouseFavorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2021-04-05HouseFavorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
2021-04-05HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-29HouseJoint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
2021-03-12HousePublic Hearing 03/17
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback