CT HB06602 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - File Number 579
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) give equal access to the electronic death registry system to funeral directors licensed in the state who have an out-of-state facility, (2) increase the availability of funeral services by allowing licensed funeral directors to not employ a full-time licensed embalmer if such funeral director is not the owner or part-owner of a funeral home, funeral service business or other establishment engaged in the practice of embalming, and (3) ensure healthy and safe practices in funeral homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Funeral Directors And Funeral Homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-13HouseFile Number 579
2023-04-13HouseHouse Calendar Number 350
2023-04-13HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-04-13HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-06HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-27HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2023-02-17HousePublic Hearing 02/22
2023-02-06HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback