CT HB06596 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - File Number 309
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated to study private equity investment in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Study By Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated Of Private Equity Investment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseFile Number 309
2023-03-29HouseHouse Calendar Number 207
2023-03-29HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-03-29HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-23HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2023-02-06HousePublic Hearing 02/10
2023-02-03HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback