CT HB06595 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To address labor matters related to COVID-19, personal protective equipment and other staffing issues.
Title
An Act Concerning Labor Matters Related To Covid-19, Personal Protective Equipment And Other Staffing Issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-04 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-04 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-15 | House | File Number 463 |
2021-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 347 |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |