CT HB06593 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-12 - File Number 531
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-12 - File Number 531
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow a housing authority to expand its jurisdiction to include other municipalities.
Title
An Act Concerning Housing Authority Jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | House | File Number 531 |
2023-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-12 | House | New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM |
2023-04-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-03 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2023-03-22 | House | File Number 157 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 123 |
2023-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-03 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |