CT HB06588 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To limit the prohibition on issuing parking citations to the owner or lessee of private commercial property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Issuance Of Parking Citations By Independent Institutions Of Higher Education And Private Secondary Schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 399 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 126 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-140
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-16HouseSenate Calendar Number 514
2019-05-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 403
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 255
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/13
2019-02-07HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation
2019-02-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback