CT HB06579 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Senate Calendar Number 380
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Senate Calendar Number 380
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To revise or repeal certain election administration laws concerning (1) admission of electors and maintenance of registry lists, (2) training of certain election officials, (3) residential status of tabulator tenders, and (4) delivery of election returns to the Secretary of the State, town clerks and registrars of voters.
Title
An Act Revising Certain Statutes Concerning Voter Registration And Election Administration.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 59 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 380 |
2021-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | House Passed |
2021-04-22 | House | File Number 579 |
2021-04-22 | House | House Calendar Number 406 |
2021-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-05 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |