CT HB06564 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) remove the sunset date relating to methods of payment that secondhand dealers and precious metals or stones dealers may use when paying for property received, and (2) require dealers of precious metals and stones to retain certain property for ten days prior to the sale or disposition of such property.
Title
An Act Concerning Secondhand Dealers, Precious Metals Or Stones Dealers And Pawnbrokers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 338 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 176 (Y: 128 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 176 (Y: 128 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-16 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-16 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-15 | House | Public Act 21-68 |
2021-06-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 499 |
2021-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | House Passed |
2021-04-26 | House | File Number 597 |
2021-04-26 | House | House Calendar Number 420 |
2021-04-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-09 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |