CT HB06564 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 420
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 420
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to study the timing of the adoption of the state budget and the effect of such timing on municipal budget preparations.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study The Timing Of The Adoption Of The State Budget And The Effect Of Such Timing On Municipal Budget Preparations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 55 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 420 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 683 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 419 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-03-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-13 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |