CT HB06564 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 420
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a task force to study the timing of the adoption of the state budget and the effect of such timing on municipal budget preparations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study The Timing Of The Adoption Of The State Budget And The Effect Of Such Timing On Municipal Budget Preparations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 55 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 420
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 683
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 419
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
2019-03-26HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-08HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-02-13HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback