CT HB06556 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reinstate payment in lieu of taxes to municipalities for revenue loss associated with the exemption of boats from the property tax.
Title
An Act Concerning The Distribution Of Vessel Registration Fees To Municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-02-07 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-02-07 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-02-01 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-01 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-30 | House | Change of Reference Transportation |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |