CT HB06553 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-20 - Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-20 - Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Transportation to evaluate and submit a report on the financial and operational feasibility of service improvements on the Danbury branch line of the New Haven Line.
Title
An Act Requiring A Service Improvements Feasibility Study Of The Danbury Rail Line.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-04-19 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2017-02-14 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |