CT HB06529 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - File Number 626
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - File Number 626
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To create an Office of the Housing Advocate, require training for housing authority commissioners and criminal history records checks for housing authority employees, and require housing authorities to provide certain contact information and notify tenants of their rights.
Title
An Act Concerning Housing Authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | File Number 626 |
2021-04-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 367 |
2021-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7529 |
2021-03-29 | House | File Number 171 |
2021-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 159 |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |