CT HB06528 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - File Number 170
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - File Number 170
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit landlords from considering the prior eviction records of prospective tenants.
Title
An Act Concerning The Sealing Of Eviction Records.
Sponsors
House Housing Committee | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Roland Lemar [D] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] |
Rep. Brian Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | File Number 170 |
2021-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 158 |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |