CT HB06527 | 2013 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-14-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require any infant formula or baby food sold or intended for sale in the state of Connecticut to include clear and conspicuous labeling if the infant formula or baby food contains any genetically engineered materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Genetically-engineered Food.

Sponsors

House of Representatives Children Committee CommitteeRep. Rick Lopes [D]Rep. Edwin Vargas [D]Rep. Bill Simanski [R]
Sen. Catherine Osten [D]Rep. John Hampton [D]Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D]Rep. Larry Butler [D]
Rep. Frank Nicastro [D]Rep. Russell Morin [D]Rep. Elaine O'Brien [D]Rep. David Arconti [D]
Rep. Gregory Haddad [D]Rep. David Zoni [D]Rep. David Baram [D]Rep. Elizabeth Boukus [D]
Rep. Patricia Widlitz [D]Rep. David Labriola [R]Rep. Elissa Wright [D]Rep. Joseph Verrengia [D]
Sen. Dante Bartolomeo [D]Rep. Al Adinolfi [R]Rep. Auden Grogins [D]Rep. James Maroney [D]
Rep. Fred Camillo [R]Rep. Charles Clemons [D]Rep. Christopher Wright [D]Rep. Thomas Vicino [D]
Rep. Ernest Hewett [D]Rep. Peter Tercyak [D]Rep. David Kiner [D]Rep. James Albis [D]
Rep. Jonathan Steinberg [D]Rep. Ezequiel Santiago [D]Rep. Andrew Fleischmann [D]Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]
Rep. Olivia Floren [R]Rep. Kim Rose [D]Sen. Theresa Gerratana [D]Sen. Mae Flexer [D]
Rep. Emil Altobello [D]Rep. Roland Lemar [D]Rep. Toni Walker [D]Rep. Terrie Wood [R]
Rep. Paul Davis [D]Rep. Edward Moukawsher [D]Rep. Theresa Conroy [D]Rep. Cecilia Buck-Taylor [R]
Sen. Joseph Crisco [D]Sen. Stephen Cassano [D]Sen. Carlo Leone [D]Rep. Brenda Kupchick [R]
Sen. Edward Meyer [D]Rep. John Shaban [R]Rep. Mike Demicco [D]Sen. Kevin Kelly [R]
Sen. Toni Harp [D]Sen. Andrea Stillman [D]Rep. Roberta Willis [D]Rep. Michael Molgano [R]
Rep. Kimberly Fawcett [D]Rep. Diana Urban [D]Sen. Kevin Witkos [R]Sen. Antonietta Boucher [R]
Sen. Anthony Musto [D]Rep. Gail Lavielle [R]

Roll Calls

2013-06-03 - House Roll Call Vote 351 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate Roll Call Vote 513 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House Roll Call Vote 278 AS AMENDED (Y: 110 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-25HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-06-14HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2013-06-13HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2013-06-07HousePublic Act 13-183
2013-06-03HouseIn Concurrence
2013-06-03HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2013-06-03HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2013-06-03HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2013-06-01HousePotential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2013-06-01HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2013-06-01HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2013-06-01HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2013-06-01HouseSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2013-06-01HouseSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8508
2013-05-27HouseFile Number 863
2013-05-27HouseSenate Calendar Number 662
2013-05-27HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2013-05-23HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2013-05-23HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7848
2013-05-07HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2013-05-07HouseNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2013-05-07HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-05-07HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-05-07HouseJoint Favorable
2013-04-30HouseReferred by House to Committee on Judiciary
2013-04-24HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2013-04-24HouseNo New File by Committee on Public Health
2013-04-24HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-04-24HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-04-23HouseJoint Favorable
2013-04-16HouseReferred by House to Committee on Public Health
2013-03-27HouseFile Number 229
2013-03-27HouseHouse Calendar Number 172
2013-03-27HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2013-03-27HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-03-21HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
2013-03-12HouseJoint Favorable
2013-03-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2013-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback