CT HB06526 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To mandate provisions in new electric supplier contracts and prohibit the assignment or transfer of customers without approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Electric Suppliers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 392 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 83 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-06-24HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2021-06-24HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2021-06-23HousePublic Act 21-117
2021-06-07HouseIn Concurrence
2021-06-07HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-07HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-10HouseFile Number 677
2021-05-10HouseSenate Calendar Number 416
2021-05-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2021-05-06HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-06HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8034
2021-03-29HouseFile Number 169
2021-03-29HouseHouse Calendar Number 157
2021-03-29HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-03-29HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM
2021-03-11HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-11HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-02-26HousePublic Hearing 03/04
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06526&which_year=2021
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/H/PDF/2021HB-06526-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/H/PDF/2021HB-06526-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/ACT/PA/PDF/2021PA-00117-R00HB-06526-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO07754-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08034-R00-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06526-R000169-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06526-R000169-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06526-R00LCO07754-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06526-R00LCO08034-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06526-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06526-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06526-R010677-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06526-R010677-BA.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TS/H/PDF/2021HB-06526-R00ET-CV20-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00083-R00HB06526-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00392-R00HB06526-SV.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback