CT HB06525 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Senate Calendar Number 578
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Senate Calendar Number 578
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to study (1) electric distribution companies and such companies' accountability and responsiveness to ratepayers, and (2) the introduction of competition in the electric transmission or distribution services industry in Connecticut.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Electric Distribution Companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 347 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 578 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2021-06-07 | House | House Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | File Number 168 |
2021-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 156 |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |