CT HB06523 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - File Number 269
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To increase the virtual net metering cap and extend the credits to manufacturers in distressed municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Virtual Net Metering Credits For Manufacturers In Distressed Municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseFile Number 269
2021-04-06HouseHouse Calendar Number 223
2021-04-06HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-04-06HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM
2021-03-19HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-18HouseJoint Favorable
2021-02-26HousePublic Hearing 03/04
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback