CT HB06523 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To set forth the authority of the fire chiefs of fire departments at certain state facilities when another fire department or company responds to a fire or other emergency at such state facility.
Title
An Act Concerning The Authority Of Fire Chiefs At Certain State Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 476 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 136 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 136 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-12 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-12 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-06 | House | Public Act 13-145 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-13 | House | File Number 803 |
2013-05-13 | House | Senate Calendar Number 593 |
2013-05-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-09 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6399 |
2013-04-08 | House | File Number 408 |
2013-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 275 |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |