CT HB06523 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - File Number 768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - File Number 768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To review appropriations from the General Fund.
Title
An Act Concerning Expenditures Of The General Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | File Number 768 | |
2011-05-05 | House Calendar Number 460 | |
2011-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-25 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-31 | Public Hearing 04/11 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |